NY A00330 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - substituted by s169b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - substituted by s169b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking within 100 feet of the entrances or exits of any public or association library.
Title
Prohibits smoking within 100 feet of the entrances or exits of any public or association library.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s169b |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.826 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | print number 330b |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | print number 330a |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00169 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.420