NY A00228 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Title
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | tabled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.199 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3441 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.457 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |