NY A00201 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the composition of the Rochester-Genesee regional transportation authority.
Title
Relates to the composition of the Rochester-Genesee regional transportation authority.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.10 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.42 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |