NY A00178 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - advanced to third reading cal.825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - advanced to third reading cal.825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a court may require the reexamination of certain drivers, including the administration of a road test, pursuant to section five hundred six of the vehicle and traffic law; provides for the court or the clerk to notify the commissioner of motor vehicles of an order for reexamination; requires for the expense of the reexamination to be the expense of the person required to be examined.
Title
Provides that a court may require the reexamination of certain drivers, including the administration of a road test, pursuant to section five hundred six of the vehicle and traffic law; provides for the court or the clerk to notify the commissioner of motor vehicles of an order for reexamination; requires for the expense of the reexamination to be the expense of the person required to be examined.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.825 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |