NY A00178 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Rochester city school district may provide transportation to pupils that live more than one-half mile from the school.
Title
Provides that the Rochester city school district may provide transportation to pupils that live more than one-half mile from the school.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | print number 178a |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06350 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to education