NY A00169 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of environmental conservation to undertake projects to protect national historic landmarks from shore erosion.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of environmental conservation to undertake projects to protect national historic landmarks from shore erosion.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s368 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.258 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00368 (Same As) 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.310