NY A00154 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-4)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s2832a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s2832a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds wage theft to the types of activities included in the crime of larceny.
Title
Adds wage theft to the types of activities included in the crime of larceny.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s2832a |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.668 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | print number 154a |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02832 (Same As) 2023-09-06 - SIGNED CHAP.353