NY A00150 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - print number 150a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - print number 150a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of elections to develop a program to be administered by all boards of elections to notify voters of certain information where their area has been redistricted.
Title
Requires the state board of elections to develop a program to be administered by all boards of elections to notify voters of certain information where their area has been redistricted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Assembly | print number 150a |
2022-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00600 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - referred to ways and means
S08114 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
S08114 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS