NY S00600 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of elections to develop a program to be administered by all boards of elections to notify voters of certain information where their area has been redistricted.
Title
Requires the state board of elections to develop a program to be administered by all boards of elections to notify voters of certain information where their area has been redistricted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1616 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00150 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - print number 150a