NY A00148 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - print number 148a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - print number 148a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state reimbursement of campaign and political committees, or legal defense funds, for payments made on behalf of the criminal or civil defense of a state employee.
Title
Prohibits state reimbursement of campaign and political committees, or legal defense funds, for payments made on behalf of the criminal or civil defense of a state employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | print number 148a |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00150 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - referred to governmental operations