NY A00126 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-5)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-5)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding additional chemicals to the list of emerging contaminants; directs the commissioner of health to establish the first list within 90 days and to update the list every three years.
Title
Relates to adding additional chemicals to the list of emerging contaminants; directs the commissioner of health to establish the first list within 90 days and to update the list every three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.88 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.716 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.725 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1759A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 126a |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.30 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01759 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A126A