NY A00108 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - signed chap.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - signed chap.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Title
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Senate | signed chap.10 |
2011-04-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-03-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.244 |
2011-03-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3870 |
2011-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.126 |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03870 (Same As) 2011-03-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A108