NY A00092 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - print number 92a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - print number 92a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a mollusk shell recycling tax credit; directs DEC to promulgate necessary regulations.
Title
Establishes a mollusk shell recycling tax credit; directs DEC to promulgate necessary regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Assembly | print number 92a |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08436 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS