NY A00075 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s2946b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s2946b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "9/11 notice act"; provides for notice to past and present employees of eligibility for the September eleventh victim compensation fund and the World Trade Center health program.
Title
Enacts the "9/11 notice act"; provides for notice to past and present employees of eligibility for the September eleventh victim compensation fund and the World Trade Center health program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s2946b |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.666 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | print number 75b |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | print number 75a |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02946 (Same As) 2023-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.364