NY A00068 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Title
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-03-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.383 |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-19 | Assembly | committed to governmental operations |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.5 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-03-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-01-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.19 |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06731 (Same As) 2012-03-14 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS