NV SB88 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act. (BDR 10-59)
Title
Enacts the Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act. (BDR 10-59)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 258. | |
2011-05-31 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-29 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-27 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-26 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | In Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | To Assembly. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-04-26 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 31.) | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. | |
2011-01-07 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |