NV SB86 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; revising provisions governing the payment of the expenses for an examination of an insurer; eliminating certain requirements relating to reporting of closed claims for medical liability insurance; eliminating the requirement that certain expired, suspended or terminated certificates be surrendered; requiring certain insurers to file quarterly statements; eliminating certain countersignature requirements; revising certain requirements for an application for a certificate of registration as an administrator; revising provisions governing annual reports filed by an administrator; revising provisions requiring an adjuster to maintain in this State a place of business; authorizing the Commissioner of Insurance to designate certain insurers as domestic surplus lines insurers; revising provisions governing the appointment of the directors of a nonprofit organization of surplus lines brokers; revising provisions governing fees which may be charged by certain brokers; authorizing the Commissioner to assess against an insurer the actual cost for the external actuarial review of a rate filing of a health plan; revising requirements relating to certificates of registration as a provider of service contracts; authorizing the Commissioner to issue a certificate of dormancy to certain captive insurers; revising provisions governing state-chartered risk retention groups for consistency with the accreditation standards of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners; revising provisions governing the suspension or revocation of a license of a captive insurer; revising certain requirements relating to certain financial transactions by a captive insurer; establishing or revising minimum capital requirements for certain insurers; making certain provisions governing rates and service organizations and portability and accountability of certain health benefit plans applicable to health maintenance organizations; revising provisions governing insurers in receivership; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to the regulation of insurers by the Division of Insurance of the Department of Business and Industry. (BDR 57-238)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 845 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 7, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 845.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 4.) To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |