NV SB84 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
Summary
Authorizes cities to create departments of alternative sentencing. (BDR 16-257)
Title
Authorizes cities to create departments of alternative sentencing. (BDR 16-257)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-30 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-30 | To printer. | |
2009-05-30 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Assembly Amendment No. 723 receded from. To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 723 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-02 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-01 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 7.) To printer. | |
2009-03-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=165 |