NV SB70 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the management of certain abandoned or unclaimed property by the Department of Veterans Services. (BDR 37-166)
Title
Revises provisions governing the management of certain abandoned or unclaimed property by the Department of Veterans Services. (BDR 37-166)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |