NV SB59 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to the state business portal. (BDR 7-448)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the state business portal. (BDR 7-448)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
2015-05-28SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-26SenateAssembly Amendment No. 691 concurred in. To enrollment.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate.
2015-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-05-21AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 691.) To printer.
2015-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-10AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-10AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-04-09SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-04-09SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-04-07SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-04-06SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-04-06SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-03SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 132.) To printer.
2015-04-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-23SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-02-02SenateRead first time. To committee.
2014-12-22SenateFrom printer.
2014-12-20SenatePrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback