NV SB57 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 62.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Nevada Commission for the Reconstruction of the V & T Railway. (BDR S-414)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the Nevada Commission for the Reconstruction of the V & T Railway. (BDR S-414)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 62. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 149.) To printer. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |