NV SB470 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; requiring the State Board of Health to require a medical facility, facility for the dependent or facility which is otherwise required to be licensed by regulations adopted by the Board to conduct training relating specifically to cultural competency for certain agents and employees of such a facility; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to health care. (BDR 40-785)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 732 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 6, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 732.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 206.) To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |