NV SB465 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the special tax on certain livestock. (BDR 50-1147)
Title
Revises provisions governing the special tax on certain livestock. (BDR 50-1147)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To committee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 223.) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |