NV SB45 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455.
Summary
Revises provisions relating to certain criminal cases involving older persons and vulnerable persons. (BDR 14-262)
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain criminal cases involving older persons and vulnerable persons. (BDR 14-262)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-31 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-29 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 587. | |
2009-05-21 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-16 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-15 | Assembly Amendment No. 587 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Assembly Amendment No. 587 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-08 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 587.) To printer. | |
2009-05-02 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-03 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 14.) To printer. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. | |
2008-12-05 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=72 |