NV SB439 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the permitting and regulation of transportation network companies. (BDR 58-633)
Title
Provides for the permitting and regulation of transportation network companies. (BDR 58-633)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 17, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 465.) To printer. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer. |