NV SB434 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to initiative and referendum petitions. (BDR 24-1150)
Title
Makes various changes relating to initiative and referendum petitions. (BDR 24-1150)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 527.) To printer. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: April 17, 2015 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |