NV SB429 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 395.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - Chapter 395.
Summary
Provides additional revenue for the provision of governmental services. (BDR 32-1320)
Title
Provides additional revenue for the provision of governmental services. (BDR 32-1320)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Chapter 395. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | |
2009-05-29 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-29 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) | |
2009-05-28 | Made Special Order of Business for Thursday, May 28, 2009, at 10:00 p.m. | |
2009-05-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-22 | Read first time. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) | |
2009-05-22 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-22 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2009-05-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 935.) | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-05-19 | To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | Waiver granted effective: May 19, 2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=1151 |