NV SB410 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History within the Records, Communications and Compliance Division of the Department of Public Safety for the modernization program for the Nevada Criminal Justice Information System; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes an appropriation to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History within the Records, Communications and Compliance Division of the Department of Public Safety for the modernization program for the Nevada Criminal Justice Information System. (BDR S-1132)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 439. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 805 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 7, Excused: 3.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 805.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |