NV SB376 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 173.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 173.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child welfare; requiring an agency which provides child welfare services to assign a certain disposition for each report concerning the possible abuse or neglect of a child received or referred to the agency; defining the types of dispositions for purposes of this requirement; deeming certain dispositions to be equivalent; imposing certain limitations on the disclosure of information relating to a report that received a disposition other than substantiated; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to child welfare. (BDR 38-503)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Chapter 173. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 267.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |