NV SB35 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; creating the Nevada Resilience Advisory Committee; setting forth the membership and duties of the Committee; providing certain exceptions to the open meeting law; requiring the Nevada Resilience Advisory Committee to prepare an annual report and submit the annual report to certain entities; authorizing the Nevada Resilience Advisory Committee to appoint subcommittees in certain situations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Nevada Resilience Advisory Committee. (BDR 19-357)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Chapter 194. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 715 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 715.) To printer. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Senate | From printer. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |