NV SB335 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professional licensing; creating the Division of Occupational Licensing within the Department of Business and Industry; creating the position of Administrator of the Division; setting forth the powers and duties of the Division and the Administrator; creating the Occupational Licensing Account; requiring each board that regulates a provider of health care to comply with certain requirements relating to the creation, retention and public disclosure of records; requiring 5 percent of the fees received by each such board to be deposited in the Occupational Licensing Account; abolishing certain boards that regulate certain professions and occupations; transferring the powers and duties of such boards to the Division; revising the membership of the Board of Medical Examiners and the State Board of Osteopathic Medicine; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to professional and occupational licensing. (BDR 54-186)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 420.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |