NV SB316 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
Summary
Directs the Legislative Committee on Health Care to consider the establishment of a health insurance exchange in Nevada. (BDR S-1108)
Title
Directs the Legislative Committee on Health Care to consider the establishment of a health insurance exchange in Nevada. (BDR S-1108)
Sponsors
Rep. Maggie Carlton [D] | Sen. Allison Copening [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Valerie Wiener [D] |
Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-01 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-30 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-30 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 985.) To printer. | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=882 |