NV SB314 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64.
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64.
Summary
Adopts the Uniform Power of Attorney Act. (BDR 13-183)
Title
Adopts the Uniform Power of Attorney Act. (BDR 13-183)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64. | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-02 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-01 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 189.) To printer. | |
2009-04-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=880 |