NV SB286 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; deeming a bailiff or deputy marshal to be a local government employee of the county in which he or she is appointed for the purposes of collective bargaining for local government employees; setting forth certain restrictions on collective bargaining between a county and an employee organization which represents bailiffs or deputy marshals; revising the definition of supervisory employee for purposes of collective bargaining for local government and state employees to include persons who provide civilian support services to a law enforcement agency; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to public employees. (BDR 23-1012)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 836.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 386.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |