NV SB269 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494.
Summary
Makes various changes to provisions governing physicians and certain related professions. (BDR 54-757)
Title
Makes various changes to provisions governing physicians and certain related professions. (BDR 54-757)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494. | |
2009-06-03 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-02 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint. | |
2009-06-01 | To printer. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 783 and 905 and further amend. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 783 and 905 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 783 and 905 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-23 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-23 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-23 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) | |
2009-05-22 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 905.) | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-22 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-21 | To Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 783.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 422.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=737 |