NV SB265 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety; requiring the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History to prepare an annual report relating to the transmission of certain information and records concerning public safety; providing for coordination between the Central Repository and the courts relating to such information and records; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain information and records concerning public safety. (BDR 14-1042)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 448.) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |