NV SB243 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 356.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 356.
Summary
Requires local law enforcement agencies to enforce certain state laws. (BDR 43-719)
Title
Requires local law enforcement agencies to enforce certain state laws. (BDR 43-719)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 356. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 799 and 889 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-21 | To printer. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-05-21 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 889.) | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-19 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 799.) To printer. | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-20 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 499.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-13 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-08 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=658 |