NV SB229 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 290.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pharmacists; revising requirements governing the collaborative practice of pharmacy and collaborative drug therapy management; making certain provisions relating to communicable diseases and exposure to biological, radiological or chemical agents applicable to pharmacists; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the practice of pharmacy. (BDR 54-823)
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Ratti [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 290. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 567 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Absent: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 567.) To printer. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 403.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |