NV SB226 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 520. (Effective June 15, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 520. (Effective June 15, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental financial administration; providing a declaration of legislative intent regarding the payment of prevailing wages on public works projects; establishing certain requirements relating to certain organizations that partner with certain public bodies for the construction of hospitals, medical education buildings or medical research buildings; requiring the payment of prevailing wages on certain leases and lease-purchase and installment-purchase agreements entered into by local governments; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing governmental financial administration. (BDR 28-494)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 520. (Effective June 15, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 967 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 967.) |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | To Assembly. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 6, Excused: 3.) |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 753.) |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 477.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |