NV SB22 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to correctional institutions; requiring the Director of the Department of Corrections to establish and maintain a package program for certain offenders; authorizing the Department to adopt regulations relating to the authority of the Director to make certain deductions from the individual account of an offender and from the wages of an offender; requiring the Director to provide a monthly statement to each offender relating to the individual account of the offender; revising the order of priority of certain deductions from the individual account of an offender and from the wages of an offender; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes relating to correctional institutions. (BDR 16-262)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-30 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 349.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |