NV SB218 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chapter 498.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Chapter 498.
Summary
Revises certain provisions governing fees charged and duties performed by constables and revises certain provisions relating to motor vehicle registration. (BDR 20-846)
Title
Revises certain provisions governing fees charged and duties performed by constables and revises certain provisions relating to motor vehicle registration. (BDR 20-846)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Chapter 498. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-30 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-30 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 742 and 881. | |
2009-05-23 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | Assembly Amendment No. 881 and 742 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 742 and 881 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | To Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | To printer. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) | |
2009-05-20 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 881.) | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-20 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-20 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-18 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-18 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 742.) To printer. | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | Action of referral rescinded. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 445.) To printer. | |
2009-04-08 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-16 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=608 |