NV SB212 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes relating to statewide primary elections. (BDR 24-36)
Title
Makes various changes relating to statewide primary elections. (BDR 24-36)
Sponsors
Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Sen. Barbara Cegavske [R] | Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Pete Livermore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-13 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=510 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB212.pdf |