NV SB201 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to pharmaceutical sales representatives; providing for the licensure and regulation of pharmaceutical sales representatives; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires licensing of pharmaceutical sales representatives. (BDR 54-444)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 261.) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |