NV SB201 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the employment of retired public employees. (BDR 23-559)
Title
Revises provisions governing the employment of retired public employees. (BDR 23-559)
Sponsors
Sen. David Parks [D] | Rep. Elliot Anderson [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Rep. Patrick Hickey [R] |
Rep. Peggy Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 257.) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |