NV SB194 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 416.
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 416.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the appointment and duties of public administrators and guardians. (BDR 20-181)
Title
Revises provisions governing the appointment and duties of public administrators and guardians. (BDR 20-181)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 416. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment Nos. 590 and 747 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-19 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-05-16 | To printer. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 747.) | |
2009-05-16 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-16 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-15 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-05-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-13 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 590.) To printer. | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-09 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-08 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-07 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-06 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 73.) To printer. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-11 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=546 |