NV SB185 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; revising requirements concerning the submission of fingerprints required to become a volunteer at a school; exempting a volunteer from undergoing a background check in certain circumstances; deeming certain students enrolled at an institution of higher education not to be volunteers in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to background checks required to become a volunteer at a school. (BDR 34-14)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 167.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |