NV SB183 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.
Summary
Revises various provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-70)
Title
Revises various provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-70)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-31 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-31 | From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 751. | |
2009-05-30 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-29 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | Assembly Amendment No. 751 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Assembly Amendment No. 751 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-21 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-20 | To Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-05-20 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-19 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 751.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Assembly. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 314 and 494.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-10 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=520 |