NV SB170 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; revising requirements governing the injection of neuromodulators derived from Clostridium botulinum or dermal and soft tissue fillers; revising the definition of chemical restraint as used in provisions regulating the use of such restraint; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to health care. (BDR 54-523)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 88.) To printer. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |