NV SB15 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 19.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 19.
Summary
Ratifies corrections of certain errors in real estate provisions and revises related provisions in a legislative enactment from a previous session. (BDR 54-661)
Title
Ratifies corrections of certain errors in real estate provisions and revises related provisions in a legislative enactment from a previous session. (BDR 54-661)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 19. | |
2009-04-29 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-28 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-23 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-02-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-02-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-02-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-02-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-02-09 | Read second time. | |
2009-02-05 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-11-26 | From printer. | |
2008-11-24 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=26 |