NV SB141 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 73.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 73.
Summary
Enacts the Uniform International Wills Act. (BDR 12-673)
Title
Enacts the Uniform International Wills Act. (BDR 12-673)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 73. | |
2009-05-11 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-06 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-02 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-03-27 | In Assembly. | |
2009-03-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-23 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-17 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-16 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-13 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=371 |